Accounts and annual returns CLEVER FOX PRESS LTD

Charity number: 1174835
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2020 03 September 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2019 03 September 2021 398 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required