MARINERS GLOUCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mariners Gloucester is a vibrant Anglican church prominently set in the heart of the regenerated Gloucester Docks, with a vision to play our part in the re-evangelisation of Gloucester and the social transformation of our great city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stacey Ann Ainslie | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
William David Charles Lee | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stancliffe Cordingley | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kieran Christopher Douglass | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Taylor | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Dillwyn Prosser | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Kingston | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.19k | £181.57k | £93.64k | £99.92k | £101.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.56k | £184.13k | £80.31k | £105.71k | £102.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Dec 2017 as amended on 16 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE CITY OF GLOUCESTER ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS DEFINED IN CANON A5 OF THE CANONS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND . IN SEEKING TO ACHIEVE THIS OBJECT, THE CIO WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): (A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; (B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; (C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; (D) PASTORAL WORK INCLUDING WORKING WITH THE SICK AND BEREAVED; (E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG, AND OTHER GROUPS WITH PARTICULAR NEEDS; AND (F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES WORKING IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mariners Hall
1A Llanthony Road
GLOUCESTER
GL2 5QT
- Phone:
- 01452540307
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window