ST. HELENS LADIES' CHOIR

Charity Number: 1173682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The chance to hone and develop their musical skills and vocal technique.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,755
Total expenditure: £3,858

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • St Helens

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST. HELENS LADIESÆ CHOIR (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beverly Margaret Jones Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
LYNDA ROBERTS Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.93k £1.49k £3.39k £2.91k £2.76k
Total expenditure £7.91k £1.72k £3.37k £4.45k £3.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2023 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Millom Avenue
Rainhill
PRESCOT
Merseyside
L35 8LU
Phone:
0151 430 6294
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available