ACTION FOR SOUTHERN AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Campaigning & Advocacy work this lies at the core of what we do. We support local actors in southern Africa and lobby key stakeholders in the UK to push for change and secure rights, equality and development for the region. Advancing education of the public on Southern Africa, by highlighting the causes of underdevelopment, poverty and conflict and exposing the destructive legacies of apartheid
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Angola
- Botswana
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Eswatini
- Lesotho
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mauritius
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Seychelles
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 September 2017: CIO registration
- ACTSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHITRA KARVE | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Vass Muir | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zita Holbourne | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BOWEN KENVYN | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARVOTHUM SEETHARAM KAMATH | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN JAMES WHITAKER | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.67k | £157.82k | £120.28k | £111.47k | £141.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.00k | £160.51k | £120.86k | £125.27k | £121.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.43k | £28.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN SOUTHERN AFRICA BY: MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOUTHERN AFRICA TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND RESEARCH, ON A RANGE OF ISSUES WHICH CONTRIBUTE TO THE RELIEF AND ERADICATION OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN SOUTHERN AFRICA, PARTICULARLY WITH RESPECT TO THE NATURE, CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SOCIAL INEQUITY, HUMAN RIGHTS VIOLATIONS, AND ENVIRONMENTAL DEGRADATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Action for Southern Africa
200A Pentonville Road
LONDON
N1 9JP
- Phone:
- 020 7832 5812
- Email:
- info@actsa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window