Accounts and annual returns SOUTH MANCHESTER YOUTH DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1175190
Charity reporting is overdue by 1592 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 131 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 131 days
Annual return 01 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 497 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 497 days
Annual return 01 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 862 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 862 days
Annual return 01 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1227 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1227 days
Annual return 01 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1592 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1592 days