MAY PARK PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising using traditional school cake sales etc. Applications to educational trusts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 06 July 2017: Standard registration
- MAY PARK PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Robinson | Chair | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rachel Drummond | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Nixon | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Blakey | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
FRAN FEY | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £5.52k | £2.59k | £4.39k | £2.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.02k | £7.02k | £2.52k | £1.50k | £4.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAY PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL
COOMBE ROAD
BRISTOL
BS5 6LE
- Phone:
- 01179030075
- Email:
- MayParkPTA@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window