Accounts and annual returns HEATH (CARDIFF) GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1173672
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 18 April 2025 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 18 April 2025 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2023 12 August 2024 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 12 August 2024 190 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2022 26 June 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 12 August 2024 555 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 22 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 22 March 2022 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 05 April 2021 60 days late Download Open in new window