Financial history HEATH (CARDIFF) GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1173672
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £1.39k £2.93k £200 £105 £700
Total expenditure £3.94k £450 £1.03k £3.34k £3.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A