PRESIDENT OF THE REGIMENTAL INSTITUTE 1ST BATTALION SCOTS GUARDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 October 2017: Standard registration
- 1 SCOTS GUARDS PRI FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Radciffe Lt Col | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.92k | £201.92k | £108.26k | £114.53k | £110.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.46k | £192.46k | £67.25k | £75.52k | £99.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2023
(These accounts |
11 April 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2023 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
30 May 2023 | 334 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2022 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
11 April 2022 | 285 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2016 as amended on 04 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS 'THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICE PERSONNEL'.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Somme Barracks
Somme Lines
CATTERICK GARRISON
North Yorkshire
DL9 4LD
- Phone:
- 01252355415
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window