DORPIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Specialist Parent Infant Psychotherapy and Counselling, Infant Massage instruction, Training for early years workforce on the benefits and importance of safe, secure parent and infant bonding, how to identify parent infant relationship issues and refer appropriately for support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £27,767 from 9 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 22 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacki O'Shea | Chair | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DOYLE | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM BAKER | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Andrew Mayers | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.96k | £118.00k | £79.86k | £223.30k | £233.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.99k | £50.80k | £87.66k | £190.25k | £225.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.41k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | £27.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 May 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF PARENTS AND CARERS AND THEIR BABIES AND YOUNG CHILDREN IN DORSET AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WHO MAY BE EXPERIENCING STRESS OR FACING PROBLEMS WITHIN THE NORMAL RANGE OF PARENTING BY: A)PROVIDING SERVICES TO PARENTS, CARERS AND THEIR YOUNG CHILDREN; B)PROMOTING TRAINING AND RESEARCH INTO THE IMPORTANCE OF EARLY CHILDHOOD DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Morris Lane Accountants
31 Commercial Road
POOLE
Dorset
BH14 0HU
- Phone:
- 07813989707
- Email:
- contact@dorpip.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window