THE CHRISTADELPHIAN SHUNEM HOME UK COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage in India, in accordance with Christadelphian Christian principles in particular but not exclusively by making grants, providing advice and supporting the coordination of overseas volunteer workers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 13 September 2017: CIO registration
- 31 July 2023: Funds received from 1075016 MORPETH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA
- THE CHRISTADELPHIAN SHUEM HOME UK COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MARK MORGAN | Chair | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Vincent | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane Vincent | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE MORGAN | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY SHEPPARD | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN STANDEVEN | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.40k | £320.69k | £184.86k | £91.17k | £121.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.21k | £177.38k | £138.10k | £135.93k | £191.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN INDIA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTADELPHIAN CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS, PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORTING THE COORDINATION OF OVERSEAS VOLUNTEER WORKERS TO ASSIST WITH THE WORK OF THE CHRISTADELPHIAN SHUNEM AND WELFARE TRUST, A CHARITABLE TRUST REGISTERED IN INDIA (REGISTRATION NO. BKIV/51/210 (ANDHRA PRADESH)) THE REGISTERED GENERAL AIM OF THE CHRISTADELPHIAN SHUNEM AND WELFARE TRUST IS TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, MEDICAL RELIEF, NUTRITION AND RESIDENTIAL SERVICES TO THE AGED AND ALSO FOR CHILDREN WHOSE PARENTS / GUARDIANS SUFFER FROM HANSONÆS DISEASE AND OTHER DEBILITATING DISEASES, PROVIDING IN PARTICULAR FOR THEIR ALL-ROUND CARE BOTH GENERAL AND SPIRITUAL AND ANY OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO THEIR WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Market Lane
Lower Penn
WOLVERHAMPTON
South Staffordshire
WV4 4UL
- Phone:
- 07814 398535
- Email:
- finance@theshunemhome.org
- Website:
-
theshunemhome.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window