AL-HAQQ ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded with the aim of, God-willing, becoming a means of acquiring the Love and Pleasure of Allah, the acquisition of which is the very purpose of our creation and existence. The Academy aims to facilitate a greater understand and awareness of the teachings of Islam and to educate people from all walks of life, especially young Muslim, in all aspects of their religious development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HABEEB ALI SYED | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD HASAN | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
UMAR THOMAS GAVIN HASSAN GALLAGHER | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £442 | £5 | £2.16k | £2.01k | £135.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £0 | £2.16k | £1.60k | £625.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS NURSERIES AND TRAINING CENTRES, AND THE PROVISION OF A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD AND CLOTHING FOR THE SAID PERSONS; (3) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) AS INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 Peacock Street
GRAVESEND
Kent
DA12 1EG
- Phone:
- +447592817000
- Email:
- admin@alhaqqacademy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window