Financial history NEWTON ABBOT PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1173779
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £93.52k £61.73k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £60.86k £64.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £52.63k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £60.29k N/A