Accounts and annual returns CREATIVE COMPUTING CLUB CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1174658
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days | |
Annual return | 10 June 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 119 days late | |
Annual return | 10 June 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 10 June 2021 | 07 April 2023 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2021 | 07 April 2023 | 362 days late | |
Annual return | 10 June 2020 | 07 April 2023 | 727 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2020 | 07 April 2023 | 727 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window