Financial history CREATIVE COMPUTING CLUB CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174658
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/06/2019 10/06/2020 10/06/2021 10/06/2022 10/06/2023
Total gross income £4.80k £905 £1.58k £2.16k £0
Total expenditure £3.65k £1.10k £1.30k £0 £5.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A