TAKE OUR HAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide local face-to-face and online support groups and networking opportunities. Increase, or coordinate, opportunities for young people, their families and friends to engage with support services through advocacy and peer support. Providing advice and advocacy to those suffering bereavement in order that they may gain access to social benefits and specialist agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 January 2018: CIO registration
- 13 December 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 13 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1195258 LET'S TALK ABOUT LOSS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £1.90k | £19.45k | £30.50k | £40.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182 | £853 | £6.09k | £21.91k | £34.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO YOUNG ADULTS RESIDENT IN NORFOLK SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING LOCAL FACE-TO-FACE AND ONLINE SUPPORT GROUPS AND NETWORKING OPPORTUNITIES. (B) INCREASING, OR COORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS TO ENGAGE WITH SUPPORT SERVICES THROUGH ADVOCACY AND PEER SUPPORT. (C) PROVIDING ADVICE AND ADVOCACY TO THOSE SUFFERING BEREAVEMENT IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY GAIN ACCESS TO SOCIAL BENEFITS AND SPECIALIST AGENCIES TO HELP PREVENT FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND/ OR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS AS A RESULT OF BEREAVEMENT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSE WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
IN NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window