Accounts and annual returns THE PSV CIRCLE

Charity Number: 1177222
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On Time