Financial history SOUTH & WEST YORKSHIRE WING ATC

Charity number: 1174182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £113.76k £28.77k £44.67k £100.57k £127.68k
Total expenditure £101.32k £17.74k £41.19k £114.61k £125.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A