GREEN MEADOW GROUP RIDING FOR DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Horse Riding for children with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- GREEN MEADOW GROUP OF THE RIDING FOR DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Dennis | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hadfield | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elena Waghorn | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Joan Richards | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Davis | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE FIDLER | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Birch | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
PAULA HADFIELD | Trustee | 01 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 1978 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.38k | £4.70k | £4.27k | £4.15k | £10.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.13k | £935 | £3.15k | £9.58k | £13.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND /OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE MID SOUTH WALES AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Green Meadow Riding Centre
Dare Valley Country Park
Aberdare
CF44 7PT
- Phone:
- 01685873504
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window