FAITH RX'D (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include Chapters: Volunteer-led chapters strengthen the fitness community through workouts, prayer, teaching, open discussion, social and service events. Training Events, Festival Gyms: Service: : Apply goal setting, strength, determination and teamwork inspired by the example and Biblical admonitions and refined by the challenge of functional fitness to serve a world in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW WILCOX | Chair | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jim Cozelman | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN DAWSON | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE WILCOX | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £3.12k | £1.40k | £181 | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33k | £1.80k | £1.76k | £1.01k | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AMONGST THE FITNESS COMMUNITY IN THE UK, THROUGH ORGANISING LOCAL CHAPTERS, TRAINING EVENTS, FESTIVALS, RESOURCING AND COMPETITION PRESENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWER GUSCOTT
HUNTSHAW
TORRINGTON
EX38 7HE
- Phone:
- 07817456322
- Email:
- faithrxduk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window