DADS UNLIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support dads across the UK to help them improve their co-parenting relationships after parental separation, and seek help for their mental health. The issues we support are suicidal ideation/self-harm, anxiety, depression, domestic abuse, loneliness and isolation. We work hard to reduce male suicide; help male victims of domestic abuse, reduce parental conflict, and improve co-parenting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£855,630
Donations and legacies | £850.96k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.38k | |
Other | £1.29k |
Total expenditure:
£564,799
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £564.66k | |
Other | £139 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £139 | |
Charitable expenditure | £564.66k | |
Retained for future use | £290.83k |
People

16 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Nelson | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|||||
James Hanaway | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shazia Khan | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James McComas | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bence Leb | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.29k | £148.03k | £350.37k | £642.47k | £855.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.21k | £137.12k | £294.35k | £500.29k | £564.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £173.44k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.12k | £55.76k | £162.40k | £15.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £641.55k | £850.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £483 | £3.38k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £437 | £1.29k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £498.72k | £564.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.44k | £1.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.57k | £139 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.20k | £18.82k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £376.89k | £674.82k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.41k | £4.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (DADS UNLIMITED) ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF RELATIONSHIP BREAKDOWN WHEREBY CHILDREN ARE INVOLVED, IN PARTICULAR BY FOCUSING ON FATHERS; 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PROVIDE THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF FATHERS IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND SERVICES FOR THE ONGOING SAFETY OF MEN WHO ARE ABUSED AND THOSE ARE AFFECTED BY ABUSE. 3. TO PROVIDE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, ASSISTANCE THROUGH CONCILIATION FOR COUPLES WITH CHILDREN WHOSE RELATIONSHIPS APPEAR TO BE BREAKING DOWN, AND WHERE SUCH RELATIONSHIPS HAVE ALREADY BROKEN DOWN, TO ADVISE AND HELP IN THE SETTLEMENT OF DIFFERENCES OR POTENTIAL DIFFERENCES OVER ASSOCIATED MATTERS SUCH AS CUSTODY AND ACCESS TO CHILDREN, AND FINANCIAL MATTERS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dads Unlimited
Metford Units 5 & 7
Evegate Business Park
Station Road
Smeeth
ASHFORD
- Phone:
- 01233 680150
- Email:
- office@dadsunltd.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window