BRISTOL INVESTMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 03 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM BREWER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AMANDEEP BHARJ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROMAN STOIKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 401 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 401 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 767 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 767 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1132 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1132 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1497 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1497 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ATTENDING THE UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL IN INVESTING IN FINANCIAL MARKETS AND INVESTMENT STRATEGIES. 2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BARN
FEN POND ROAD
IGHTHAM
SEVENOAKS
TN15 9JF
- Phone:
- 07964043505
- Website:
-
bif.squarespace.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window