UK CERVICAL CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision and objectives are to protect and enhance the health and relieve sickness for the public benefit in the UK and developing countries by eliminating Cervical Cancer and enabling treatment for women with Cervical Cancer and related health issues by the provision of education, screening, treatment and vaccination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bhutan
- India
- Nepal
- Vietnam
Governance
- 23 April 2018: Standard registration
- UK CERVICAL CANCER LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH ANTHONY TOOMA BA LLB MB | Chair | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Brient | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Greenfield | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MELVYN HILL BSc CEd FD | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENISE KATHERINE LEE BFA MT | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.42k | £22.20k | £36.98k | £15.27k | £4.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.04k | £18.39k | £35.90k | £14.12k | £3.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 APR 2018
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK OR ELSEWHERE THROUGH ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) PROVIDING EDUCATION ABOUT THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CERVICAL CANCER AND OTHER WOMEN'S DISEASES AND CANCERS; B) PROMOTING SCREENING, TREATMENT AND VACCINATION FOR CANCER AND PARTICULARLY CERVICAL CANCER; C) FACILITATING MEDICAL SCREENING, VACCINATION AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CERVICAL AND SIMILAR CANCERS; D) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND RELIEF TO THOSE IN NEED WHO ARE AFFECTED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BY CERVICAL CANCER AND OTHER RELATED WOMEN'S DISEASES AND CANCERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A GURNEY LANE
NORWICH
NR4 7SB
- Phone:
- 01603250948
- Email:
- info@ukcervicalcancer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window