WOOLSERY & DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SHOW

Charity number: 1175580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main activity is to organise an agricultural Show every year, on the last Monday of July. The show works hard to retain it's agricultural roots, and attract local support, as well as educate and inform those with less countryside knowledge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £38,057
Total expenditure: £29,203

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WOOLSERY SHOW (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonny Furse Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
BRIAN BUTLER Trustee 13 July 2017
None on record
DEREK WALTER LOTT Trustee 13 June 2017
BUDE AND HOLSWORTHY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WOOLFARDISWORTHY SPORTS AND COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £37.60k £36.31k £38.06k
Total expenditure £1.15k £3.40k £35.88k £30.68k £29.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 19 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 19 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Harbour Lights
Horns Cross
Bideford
Bideford
Bideford
Devon
Phone:
01409240328
Website:

woolseryshow.org.uk