EASTERTON, MARKET LAVINGTON AND URCHFONT LINK GOOD NEIGHBOUR SCHEME.

Charity number: 1174506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Charity is to relieve poor, sick, elderly & disabled persons by providing transportation services to reduce the need, hardship or distress of such people in the communities of Easterton, Market Lavington and Urchfont.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,187
Total expenditure: £16,976

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 September 2017: Standard registration
  • 04 May 2023: Funds received from 500806 COMBINED CHARITIES FUND FOR THE MENTALLY HANDICAPP...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EASTERTON, MARKET LAVINGTON AND URCHFONT LINK SCHEME. (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN BOWLER Chair 05 May 2016
None on record
ROGER WEBB Trustee 05 May 2016
None on record
BARBARA BOWLER Trustee 05 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.84k £5.15k £8.89k £10.86k £16.19k
Total expenditure £7.94k £4.36k £6.54k £8.44k £16.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 Stirling Road
Market Lavington
DEVIZES
Wiltshire
SN10 4DD
Phone:
01380812604
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available