REBOOT THE FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of sustainable development, conservation and protection of the environment, ethical business, and good citizenship, through the application of the Golden Rule (treat others and the planet as you would wish to be treated) to the challenges and opportunities facing humanity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amber Nuttall | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Homeister | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Patton-Cemm | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ami Shpiro | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIM ELISABETH POLMAN M.A. | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY BRADSHAW | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.58k | £375.30k | £466.85k | £570.92k | £319.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.16k | £347.68k | £337.21k | £548.00k | £387.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £558.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £548.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £29.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. IN THESE OBJECTS, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS."
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 PRIORY AVENUE
LONDON
W4 1TZ
- Phone:
- 07789 735650
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window