ENGLISH MISSION OF THE SISTERS OF ST. LOUIS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Caring for Members of the Institute - especially in illness and old age. Prayer and Spiritual growth and making buildings available for retreats to diverse groups of people. Formal and Informal Education including Parish and Pastoral work. Promoting Justice and peace and the integrity of Creation. Overseas involvement by providing financial and material aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Benin
- Brazil
- Ethiopia
- France
- Ghana
- Ireland
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 21 June 2017: CIO registration
- 09 January 2019: Funds received from 255245 TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH THE INSTITUTE OF...
- SISTERS OF ST LOUIS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER PATRICIA OJO SR | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sister Augustina Agyirey-Kwakye | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARGARET HEALY SR | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.61m | £339.96k | £1.14m | £324.39k | £277.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £714.17k | £1.44m | £713.89k | £478.59k | £4.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | £199.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £173.80k | N/A | £120.98k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £3.44m | N/A | £818.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £338.05k | N/A | £689.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £27.77k | N/A | £24.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.02k | N/A | £16.79k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £24.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £348.36k | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 21 JUN 2017 AMENDED ON 20 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE INSTITUTE AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE INSTITUTE LEADER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stone King Llp
Boundary House
91-93 Charterhouse Street
London
EC1M 6HR
- Phone:
- 07940025139
- Email:
- sslfinance@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window