FIBROID FORUM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run quarterly fibroid support group meetings aimed at raising awareness of fibroids and how the condition impacts on the lives of sufferers; educating and empowering women suffering from fibroids to enable them to make informed choices about the best treatment options and how to access them. The meetings provide a forum for practitioners in the field to share information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AUDREY DELORES SKERVIN | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAWN MARIE MARTIN | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN NKONYE ODOZI | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE MAXINE MAYE | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELFREDA SKERVIN | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £220 | £40 | £0 | £19 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £144 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF WOMEN WHO ARE SUFFERING OR ARE AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM UTERINE FIBROIDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · RAISING AWARENESS OF FIBROIDS AND HOW IT IMPACTS ON THE LIVES OF SUFFERERS; · EDUCATING AND EMPOWERING WOMEN SUFFERING FROM FIBROIDS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE INFORMED CHOICES ABOUT THE BEST TREATMENT OPTIONS FOR THEM AND HOW TO ACCESS THEM; AND · AIDING THE RESEARCH OF THE CAUSES OF FIBROIDS TO HELP ALLEVIATE AND ELIMINATE THE CONDITION AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
253 LORDSHIP LANE
LONDON
SE22 8JF
- Phone:
- 07932230664
- Email:
- fibroidforum@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window