Financial history THE HU-SHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1173495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.40k £2.10k £4.60k £3.60k £3.00k
Total expenditure £4.33k £2.07k £4.60k £3.60k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A