THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY DE HAURA, NEW SHOREHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PCC of St Mary de Haura- Promoting in the parish , the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical through regular public worship which is open to all, and by providing a quiet space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work visiting the sick bereaved and care homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 September 2017: Standard registration
- ST MARY DE HAURA, NEW SHOREHAM (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Clay | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Louise Bartlett | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Rathbone | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Allinson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE CLARK | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK POTTER | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stephen Davies | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Downes | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN SMITH | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN TOMPKIN | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Evan John Tyson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Gillian Robertson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
LOUISE GILL | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Smith | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sayers | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Josephine Claire Johnson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.88k | £128.53k | £242.81k | £133.32k | £132.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.73k | £112.45k | £140.59k | £157.58k | £168.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARY DE HAURA PARISH OFFICE
1 NEW ROAD
SHOREHAM-BY-SEA
BN43 6RA
- Phone:
- 01273440202
- Email:
- smdh.office@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window