Accounts and annual returns THE MONTGOMERY WATERWAY RESTORATION TRUST

Charity Number: 510448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 01 September 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 01 September 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 30 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 14 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 25 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window