Financial history THE MONTGOMERY WATERWAY RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 510448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £132.97k £193.43k £160.38k £325.86k £172.85k
Total expenditure £36.79k £18.58k £56.74k £51.04k £49.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A