Financial history ROBES PROJECT

Charity Number: 1174060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £280.44k £318.21k £286.49k £195.53k £230.73k
Total expenditure £215.31k £293.38k £335.52k £230.55k £290.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A