Financial history THE BRIDGE- NEW LIFE CHURCH

Charity number: 1174129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £98.05k £67.08k £56.34k £52.78k £64.10k
Total expenditure £74.05k £73.07k £67.01k £70.48k £55.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A