Financial history EVANGELICAL GLOBAL OUTREACH

Charity number: 1174112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.54k £9.25k £10.00k £7.56k £9.40k
Total expenditure £7.10k £11.27k £10.72k £8.03k £10.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A