Financial history EMPOWER AND EVOLVE

Charity number: 1177052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £22.20k £51.37k £39.80k £33.06k £26.65k
Total expenditure £0 £5.75k £35.25k £10.25k £6.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A