Accounts and annual returns TWIG: THE MEDICAL TRANSLATION DATABASE

Charity number: 1176773
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 January 2021 On Time