Trustees PILGRIM HERITAGE SAILING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID JAMES RANGE Chair 08 May 2017
None on record
Richard Thomas Kirby Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Andy Murray Trustee 04 July 2024
None on record
Thomas Searle Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Jeremy Alan Neech Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record