Financial history AUTISM SUPPORT CRAWLEY

Charity Number: 1179383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.77k £12.77k £2.34k £9.98k £52.70k
Total expenditure £20.69k £20.69k £1.66k £16.01k £33.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.50k £20.00k