Financial history THE HULL LOURDES SICK FUND

Charity number: 510460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £1.69k £725 £2.42k £2.04k £2.14k
Total expenditure £1.42k £375 £258 £4.85k £3.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A