SADBERGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Darlington
Governance
- 09 October 2017: CIO registration
- 11 July 2023: Funds received from 506245 SADBERGE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Smith | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Falcus | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Gannon | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jacqueline Mucklin | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond James Murphy | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike Hill | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALLY SCHOTT | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN BURGESS | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNY HILL | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.56k | £34.66k | £35.70k | £78.33k | £74.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.48k | £13.38k | £12.28k | £76.45k | £70.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
23 April 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SADBERGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE/VILLAGE HALL AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE/VILLAGE HALL FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sadberge Village Hall
Darlington Road
Sadberge
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL2 1SB
- Phone:
- 01325333333
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window