RANWELL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RUN PLAYGROUP FOR 24 CHILDREN IN THE MORNING AND 24 IN THE AFTERNOON, TWO SESSIONS A DAY, AGE 2-5 YEARS OF AG
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 12 September 2017: CIO registration
- 17 March 2020: Funds received from 297078 RANWELL PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faye Kitchener | Chair | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY LEAHY | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.33k | £121.92k | £102.56k | £89.25k | £71.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.74k | £67.80k | £81.84k | £87.17k | £91.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £89.25k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 MCCULLUM ROAD
LONDON
E3 5HZ
- Phone:
- 02089816310
- Email:
- ranwellplaygroup@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window