CYMDEITHAS RHIENI AC ATHRAWON YSGOL GYMRAEG MELIN GRUFFYDD CAERDYDD / YSGOL GYMRAEG MELIN GRUFFYDD PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION CARDIFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PTA fundraising activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cardiff
Governance
- 12 September 1980: Standard registration
- CYMDEITHAS RHIENI AC YSGOL GYMRAEG MELIN GRUFFYDD CAERDYDD/YSGOL GYMRAEG MELIN GRUFFYDD PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION CARDIFF (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Richard Hopkins | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.87k | £5.10k | £1.68k | £2.42k | £9.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £4.43k | £123 | £2.70k | £5.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 July 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 AUGUST 1980 AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 1988.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING YSGOL GYMRAEG MELIN GRUFFYDD BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2.01 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eglwys Newydd Primary School
Glan-Y-Nant Road
CARDIFF
CF14 1AP
- Phone:
- 02920691247
- Email:
- nhopkins.pta@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window