HELPING OTHERS (MENTAL HEALTH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping others was created in May 2017 by a Facebook group offering support for people struggling with mental health as a small town there is not enough support . Helping others as grown rapidly and now help homeless, dvap, elderly, people struggling with poverty. Helping others volunteers are all there for there own reasons and can share their stories with people who are finding life difficult .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 August 2017: CIO registration
- Helping Others health & wellbeing (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STACY ramsker | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
david alder | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLARE TIPPING | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
nicola Vause | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.67k | £74.14k | £73.26k | £104.54k | £85.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.14k | £46.73k | £62.67k | £109.41k | £89.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.56k | £1.45k | £10.71k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN GOOLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30-32 Pasture Road
GOOLE
DN14 6EZ
- Phone:
- 01405762593
- Email:
- Helpingothersmh@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window