AL IHSAN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Al Ihsan is involved in charitable activites to promote integration and harmony among various communities through regular gatherings and events. It also assists people who are in need especially the very poor, helpless and homeless through various fund raising drives. It also provides moral support and chapel services to families grieving due to sudden and untimely loss of family members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 28 November 2017: CIO registration
- AL IHSAN DAÆWA CELL UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIRAJUDHEEN MOHAMED | Chair | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
RESHEED PALLIPARAMBIL ABDUL KADER | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ASHRAF KARUPPAM VEETTIL | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ISMAYEL NADUKKANDI | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDULGAFOOR MUHAMMED | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL AZEEZ ETTUVEETTIL | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|||||
VELUTHARAMBATH SHAHUL HAMEED | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.28k | £28.97k | £66.69k | £49.48k | £102.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.13k | £18.37k | £46.56k | £45.78k | £74.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 238 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 19 November 2019 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 23 December 2019 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2017 as amended on 12 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE KERALITE COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: I. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE KERALITE COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; II. INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE KERALITE COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES. C. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN KERALITE CULTURE AND HERITAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 6
90 AKERMAN ROAD
LONDON
SW9 6SN
- Phone:
- 07961950231
- Email:
- alihsanuk@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window