COVERDALE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 1174155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a village hall that runs activity club,social evening,theater productions and over facilities for hire. We also have a sports field which is open to the public for recretional puposes and can also be hire for functions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,308
Total expenditure: £9,118

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 2017: CIO registration
  • 14 June 2018: Funds received from 506483 COVERDALE MEMORIAL HALL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN PETER SUTTILL Chair 01 May 2016
None on record
Louise Deeming Trustee 26 October 2023
None on record
ELIZABETH WHISTLER Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
HEIDI ADAMS Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Matthew Wilkes Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record
JOHN DAVID HERBERT Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
Jenny Walker Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
LIZ SHEEHAN Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
DAN HESELTINE Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
STEPHEN GEOFFREY LAMBERT Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
HOWARD THOMAS DIP AD Trustee 01 May 2000
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.33k £4.13k £12.25k £5.33k £13.31k
Total expenditure £6.55k £9.39k £5.47k £7.58k £9.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 October 2024 244 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Littleside Cottage
Carlton
LEYBURN
North Yorkshire
DL8 4BD
Phone:
01969640689
Email:
No information available