IKON CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Faith in the county of Derbyshire and such other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Charity Trustees may from time to time decide; and the relief of persons who are in need by reason of financial hardship, ill-health, sickness, age and such other social or economic disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- CHESTERFIELD VINEYARD TRUST AND CHRISTIAN LIFE CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BENGER | Chair | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Buckley | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Yeomans | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BUCKLEY | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Lloyd IPPMDIP | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Wilkins | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £401.50k | £879.05k | £506.17k | £479.74k | £458.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £389.96k | £472.02k | £507.62k | £598.26k | £607.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £873.91k | £501.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £1.84k | £1.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £3.26k | £2.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £38 | £30 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £459.82k | £493.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £12.20k | £14.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND 4.2 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL-HEALTH, SICKNESS, AGE AND SUCH OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ikon Church
Unit A-c
Vanguard Trading Estate
Britannia Road
CHESTERFIELD
S40 2TZ
- Phone:
- 01246768677
- Email:
- gavin@ikon.church
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window