Financial history CAUSEWAY EDUCATION LTD

Charity number: 1175109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £494.32k £483.00k £702.41k £710.74k £798.16k
Total expenditure £902.15k £647.45k £558.97k £715.36k £792.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £702.26k £710.26k £796.93k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £146 £474 £1.23k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £503.67k £660.02k £730.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £55.31k £55.34k £62.03k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.81k £1.56k £2.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0