GREAT TEY COMMUNITY POOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phase 1: To facilitate the replacement of the currently derelict community swimming pool situated within the grounds of Great Tey School. Phase 2: To provide a facility that would benefit the school, village, and the wider local community to enable the advancement of community health and fitness through swimming activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 29 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEC BROOKS | Chair | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Almond | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Barron | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLARE ELLIS | Trustee | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS DAVID BAKER B.A. HONS | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DOW | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.86k | £325 | £25.34k | £5.43k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.52k | £673 | £6 | £1.64k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 304 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN GREAT TEY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A SWIMMING POOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Farmfield Road
Great Tey
COLCHESTER
CO6 1AB
- Phone:
- 01206210248
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window