Financial history GIVE ME HOPE AFRICA WALES

Charity number: 1175839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.29k £10.29k £16.86k £17.38k £14.35k
Total expenditure £5.63k £9.60k £11.18k £17.19k £14.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.34k £5.21k £780 N/A